THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:58:53 AM
Sharma, Vinay
CPSO#:
100549
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Dr, unit 1
Brampton ON L7A 3Y6
Phone: 905-840-2008
Fax: 905-840-2002
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Jul 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
|
Active |