THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:07:50 AM
Tuma, Mazin
CPSO#:
100544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAZIN TUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |