THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:43:08 PM
Juszczynski, Caroline
CPSO#:
100508
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
24 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queens University
Cardiology
70 Barrie street
Kingston ON N6A 5C1
Phone: (613) 533-6000
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE JUSZCZYNSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;
(2) Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 19 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2022 to 08 May 2023
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 09 May 2023 to 03 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 04 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |