THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:51:54 AM
Kenny, Stephanie Anne
CPSO#:
100499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811 Ext. 8201
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE KENNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2019 |