THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:41:58 AM
Shukla, Tushar
CPSO#:
100491
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Box 255, Room W1207 - Main Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 24 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2019 |