THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:24:31 AM
Braidek, Jessica Lynne
CPSO#:
100438
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
9th Floor, Rm 932
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4569
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Aug 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNNE BRAIDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 06 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 06 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2018 |