THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:04:04 PM
Doumouras, Barbara Stella
CPSO#:
100419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Queen's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
Room E203
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4822
Fax: 416-480-4722
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA STELLA DOUMOURAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMOURAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Apr 2023
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |