THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:22:55 PM
Muruganandam, Padma
CPSO#:
100412
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Thanjavur Medical College, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2220 Kildare Rd
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: 519-253-5253
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:17 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PADMA MURUGANANDAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGANANDAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2019 to 31 May 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 19 Jul 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2021 |