THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:02:49 AM
Paina, Mihaela
CPSO#:
100408
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Romanian
Education: Universitatea Iuliu Hatieganu, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
564 Belmont Ave West, Suite 402
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: (519)954-6404
Fax: (519) 224-0137
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:13 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIHAELA PAINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2018 to 06 May 2018
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2017 |