THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:13:39 AM
Curran, Scott Joseph
CPSO#:
100406
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Services Group
18 Newberry Street, Belleville On
Belleville ON K8N3N3
Phone: 613-966-4377
Fax: 613-966-4730
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |