THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:11:35 PM
Karimi, Shirin
CPSO#:
100369
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
14 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Isfahan University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Sep 2016
CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
CF - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2017 |