THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:52:13 AM
Osborne, Roisin Mary
CPSO#:
100327
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613 798 5555 Ext. 13068
Fax: 613 761 5328
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Nov 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROISIN MARY OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 25 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2020 to 19 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |