THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:27:06 PM
Thangaroopan, Aananthan
CPSO#:
100315
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northeast Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
4th Floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-522-6237
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AANANTHAN THANGAROOPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANGAROOPAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2021 |