THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:19:13 AM
Holland, Alyson Vera Foskien
CPSO#:
100299
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:12 Jan 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 15 Nov 2016
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2016 |