THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:46:43 PM
Martins, Jennifer Natalie
CPSO#:
100270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905)-576-8711 Ext. 32981
Fax: 905-721-4780
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER NATALIE MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |