THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:00:52 AM
Giles, Andrew Earl
CPSO#:
100264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-2383
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:17 Sep 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW EARL GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Apr 2020 to 06 May 2020
EL - Thoracic Surgery
Queen's University, 14 Jan 2021 to 10 Feb 2021
EL - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2022 |