THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:14:39 PM
Ko, Gary Tsun Yin
CPSO#:
100257
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165864800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY TSUN YIN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Surgical Foundations
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - General Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Surgical Foundations
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |