THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:39:55 PM
Halperin, Joshua Mark
CPSO#:
100252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines, ON
Diagnostic Services
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905 378 4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MARK HALPERIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPERIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2018 |