THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:02:48 AM
Tan, Elvin Yan-Zhang
CPSO#:
100224
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
51 Parkway (the)
ActiveCare Medical Clinic Beaverbro
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
Phone: 6133197996
Fax: 6132718998
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Aug 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELVIN YAN-ZHANG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2015 |