THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 0:19:36 AM
Amin, Bahar
CPSO#:
100200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Medical Centre
37 The Links rd
North York ON M2P 1T7
Phone: (416) 730-1212
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAHAR AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |