THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:11:50 AM
Ahken, Stephanie Michelle
CPSO#:
100183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:15 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MICHELLE AHKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHKEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 16 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2019 |