THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:44:13 PM
Salz, Liad
CPSO#:
100175
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
343 Wilson Ave., suite # 303
Toronto ON M3H 1T1
Phone: 416-785-8412
Fax: 416-785-8324
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Jan 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIAD SALZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2017 |