THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:47:53 AM
Meloche, Jennifer
CPSO#:
100174
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Road
2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M4
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MELOCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELOCHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 06 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
EL - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |