THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:54:47 AM
Osman, Elrasheed Sid Ahmed El Hag
CPSO#:
100139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Surgery
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:11 Oct 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jul 2013
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |