THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:18:07 PM
Huang, Shirley Chien-Chieh
CPSO#:
100104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 14195
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY CHIEN-CHIEH HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
EL - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |