THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 19:12:21 PM
Aliabadi, Hossein
CPSO#:
100071
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-245 Wyecroft Rd
Unit 1
Oakville ON L6K 3Y6
Phone: 289-817-7246
Fax: 289-817-2273
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: H. Aliabadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOSSEIN ALIABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIABADI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2015 |