THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:53:16 PM
Baamer, Ruba Fuad B
CPSO#:
100069
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2013 to 29 May 2013
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2016 to 29 May 2016
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 2016 |