THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:16:49 AM
Bojilov, Borislav Gueorguiev
CPSO#:
100068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University--Pleven, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2013 to 20 Jun 2013
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 06 Oct 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |