THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:43:53 AM
AlSanad, Yazeed Hamad S
CPSO#:
100061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Sharjah, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Workman Way
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Nov 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |