THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:38:18 AM
Baluch, Narges
CPSO#:
100058
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
unit 102-9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
Phone: (905) 597-8809
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Hospital |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Apr 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARGES BALUCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALUCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 14 Apr 2013
PEAP - R - Urology
University of Toronto, 15 Apr 2013 to 01 May 2013
EL - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 19 Sep 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 09 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 08 Apr 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 09 Apr 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 05 Apr 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 06 Apr 2023
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2024 to 06 Apr 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2023 |