THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:52:11 PM
Selhi, Zoe
CPSO#:
100057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Albany Medical College, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
752 King Street West
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 100
802 New Holland Avenue
Lancaster, PA 17601
USA
Date Received: 06 May 2014
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZOE SELHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2022 |