THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:47:03 AM
Taheri, Amir Yousef
CPSO#:
100042
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Semnan University of Medical Sciences an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2014 to 26 Jan 2014
EL - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Jan 2014 to 09 Feb 2014
EL - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2017 |