THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:20:10 AM
Shaikh, Rizwan Ahmed
CPSO#:
100019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Spanish, Urdu
Education: Sind Medical College, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lormel Medical Centre
Unit 8
10 Lormel Gate
Brampton ON L7A 2K7
Phone: (905) 846-5335
Fax: (905) 846-2666
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 11 Jan 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Apr 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 21 Apr 2023 |
|
Active |