THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:57:31 AM
Pollard, Joseph Alexander
CPSO#:
100018
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Oklahoma State Uni College of Osteopathi, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:25 Mar 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALEXANDER POLLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |