THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:55:28 AM
Benjamin, Sophiya
CPSO#:
100014
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Christian Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 479-4300 Ext. 7998
Fax: (519) 894-8308
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:24 May 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
|
Active |