skip to content

North, Rosamaria Antonia

CPSO#: 109213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807)-684-6000 Ext. 6100 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. R. North ( CPSO# 109213)
Dr. D. Spicer ( CPSO# 114781)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Rosamaria North Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. North ( CPSO# 109213)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSAMARIA ANTONIA NORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2019