skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 13:14:11 PM

Kelton, John Greenhow

CPSO#: 27626

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Feb 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC 3H50
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28603
Fax: (905) 524-2983 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John G. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kelton ( CPSO# 27626 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3H50
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN GREENHOW KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1978