THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:27:36 AM
Kelton, John Greenhow
CPSO#:
27626
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC 3H50
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28603
Fax: (905) 524-2983
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN GREENHOW KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 1978 |