skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:22:22 AM

Roy Goswami, Ipsita

CPSO#: 99968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology and
Neurology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IPSITA ROY GOSWAMI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ROY GOSWAMI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ROY GOSWAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ROY GOSWAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ROY GOSWAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ROY GOSWAMI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ROY GOSWAMI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 13 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 14 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020