skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 1:33:51 PM

Xiong, Xin

CPSO#: 99746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
CPC Building (Parkdale Clinic)
Main Floor, Room 64
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4M9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18959
Fax: 613-761-4508 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIN XIONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 10 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015