skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:21:05 PM

Lal, Anita

CPSO#: 99686

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Dec 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provincial Forensic
Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4040
Fax: (416) 314-4060 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Forensic Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Anita Lal may practise medicine independently in forensic pathology,
                  only.