skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 1:32:29 PM

Callaghan, Sarah

CPSO#: 99655

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017