skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:49:15 PM

Al Busafi, Mohamed Saif Said

CPSO#: 99554

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 19 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013