skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:16:28 PM

Lee, King Chien

CPSO#: 99395

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 13 Sep 2012 to 06 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013