skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:07:58 AM

Kenawey, Mohamed Omar Mohamed Ahmed

CPSO#: 99383

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sohag University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 19 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013