skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:07:30 PM

Haddad, Elias

CPSO#: 99365

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 08 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013