skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:35:12 PM

Fatima, Anis

CPSO#: 99353

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shoppers World Medical Centre
Suite 144
499 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone: (905) 796-7127
Fax: (905) 796-3977 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fatima ( CPSO# 99353 )

Business Address:
Shoppers World Medical Centre
Suite 144
499 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N9
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIS FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014