skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:00:30 AM

Cohn, Ronald Doron

CPSO#: 99325

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Gesamthochschule Essen, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5792 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 01 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2015 Active
             1.    Dr. Ronald Doron Cohn may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Clinical Genetics, University of Toronto,
                        in which Dr. Cohn holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Cohn no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.