skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 10:23:10 AM

Slodkowska, Elzbieta

CPSO#: 99299

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Aug 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite E4 13
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7356 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active
             Dr. Elzbieta Slodkowska may practise medicine independently in anatomical
            pathology, only.