skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:37:43 AM

Lai, Chi Kien

CPSO#: 99148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul's Hospital
Department of Pathology
2nd Floor, Providence Bldg
1081 Burrard Street
Vancouver BC  V6Z 1Y6
Phone: (604) 682-2344
Fax: (604) 806-8158

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chi Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai ( CPSO# 99148 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Laboratory Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
S.3.452
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

USA - California

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHI KIEN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012